Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Joel Friedman Aka Yoel Friedman, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Snitow, Gary Steven, against John Doe Aka "@Yoelfriedman5", represented by Illish, Marc, Korsinsky, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with LANDICINO, PT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Defamation, Tortious Inte) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 22, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: August 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: March 22, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: March 22, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 04, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: December 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 25, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 25, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 07, 2020NOTICE
Date: August 24, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 11, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2020NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 07, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 11, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 22, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2021 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 07, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY TOGETHER WITH ORDER |
||
December 30, 2020 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice |
||
December 21, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 12/14/2020 |
||
December 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Exhibit E - Court Order Transferring Motion |
||
December 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) Exhibit F - October 2020 Court Order |
||
December 14, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3) Affirmation of Gary S. Snitow, Esq. in Reply |
||
December 14, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #002) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART MOTION Judge: CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART |
|
December 14, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART MOTION P/O LK-CCP Judge: CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART |
|
December 11, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.