Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Elizabeth Alexis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Albert, Marc S., against Askhat Akhmedshin, Mes Brokerage Inc, represented by Ciment, William M., Haber, Eugene, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Ingrid Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: December 18, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: June 04, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 21, 2020NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: September 22, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 04, 2020NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: September 13, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 12, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 04, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 13, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2022 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
September 13, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 12, 2021 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 11/8/21 |
||
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
September 22, 2020 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | ||
September 21, 2020 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Affirmation of Good Faith | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Akhmedshin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.