Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ace Funding Source Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gilerman, Erica Regina, against Bobbi S Gregory, Brandon Keith Gregory, Good Graces Llc D B A Good Graces Pharmacy, represented by Caridi, Marco Rocky, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Peter P. Sweeney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter P. Sweeney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint was filed by ACE Funding Source LLC against Good Graces LLC, Brandon Keith Gregory, and Bobbi S Gregory. ACE Funding Source LLC is a New York limited liability company engaged in the receivables financing business. Good Graces LLC is a...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 07, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 14, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: December 11, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Purchase of Future Receivables Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 07, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2023SUMMONS
Date: September 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affirmation of Service for Order removing Marco Caridi as Counsel for All Defendants |
||
January 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Ex B - Certified Mail for Order, sent to All Defendants |
||
January 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Ex A - Order from Court, Removing Marco Caridi as Counsel for All Defendants |
||
January 08, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service re Personal Service of OSC Docs to Defendants BRANDON KEITH GREGORY Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service re Personal Service of OSC Docs to Defendants BRANDON KEITH GREGORY ... show more |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A - Signed OSC and Affirmation re Marco Caridi Withdrawing as Counsel for All Defendants |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D - FedEx Proof of Service to Plaintiffs' Attorney Erica Gilermani |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service re Personal Service of OSC Docs to Defendants GOOD GRACES LLC d/b/a Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service re Personal Service of OSC Docs to Defendants GOOD GRACES LLC d/b/a ... show more |
||
January 05, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affirmation of Service for OSC and Affirmation re Marco Caridi Withdrawing as Counsel for All Defend Affirmation of Service for OSC and Affirmation re Marco Caridi Withdrawing as Counsel for All Defend ... show more |
||
December 11, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.