Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Alide Pierre-Louis, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Chumber, Prety, Harris, Seth A, against Saul Arber, The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, Shapiro, Adam Philip, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kings Cdp20 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, Alide Pierre-Louis, is suing Saul Arber and the City of New York. The complaint alleges that Saul Arber, as the owner and operator...
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 24, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 23, 2024RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 04, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 04, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 04, 2023SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: November 13, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 24, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 27, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 13, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: October 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 04, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 04, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
December 04, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Combined Demands to Defendant THE CITY OF NEW YORK |
||
December 04, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Defendant THE CITY OF NEW YORK's Combined Demands Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Defendant THE CITY OF NEW YORK's Combined Demands Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
December 04, 2023 | Bill of Particulars to Defendant THE CITY OF NEW YORK | ||
November 27, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS TO DEFENDANT SAUL ARBER |
||
November 27, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: PLAINTIFF'S COMBINED DEMANDS TO DEFENDANT SAUL ARBER |
||
November 27, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
November 13, 2023 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.