Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rigoberto Guinea Gutierrez, Zoyla Irma Garcia, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by London, Kenneth L, Shapiro, Alexander T, against 83 Le Inc, Abc Management Company 1 To 10, John Doe 1 To 10, represented by Mcgivney, Lawrence J, Ognibene, Joseph Leonard, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Ingrid Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Slip Fall) |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 01, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 08, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 08, 2022ANSWER
Date: May 26, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 21, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 13, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 14, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dtd 1/20/23 |
||
September 08, 2022 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
September 08, 2022 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
August 01, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 21, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 21, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
June 14, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiffs' 1st Set of Demands for Discovery & Inspection |
||
June 13, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiffs' Combined Demands |
||
May 26, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
November 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.