Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Miguel A Castillo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tona, Thomas, against Adan A Belliard, Revel Transit Inc., represented by Bruder, Jennifer Mary, Gibson, Chauncey Alexander, Tsanatelis, Constantinos James, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Ingrid Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 31, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 31, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 31, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 31, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 19, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 31, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 31, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 31, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 19, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Combined Demands - Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 19, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: February 03, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 19, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 30, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 25, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 20, 2022ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 12, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 12, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 14, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Attached authorizations
Date: August 31, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 30, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 04, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 30, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 31, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 26, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 22, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - Aex  (Motion #3)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
August 31, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Defendant's Demand for Discovery & Inspection |
||
August 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Attached authorizations Attached authorizations Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
August 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Exhibit C - Email 11.30.22 |
||
August 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) Exhibit G - Order from J. Lawrence Knipel dated May 15, 2023 |
||
August 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Exhibit D - Email 2.3.23 |
||
August 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) Exhibit E - SENT GFL to P re 10.10.22 Discovery Demands |
||
August 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #4) Exhibit F - Affirmation in Support of Cross-Motion to Compel |
||
August 30, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) Notice of Motion to Preclude |
||
August 30, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #4) Affirmation in Support of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.