Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ebony Kirk, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pager, William, against Jennifer Alvarez, represented by Greenberg, Eric Ross, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Karen B Rothenberg presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 12, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 26, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 01, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 17, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 21, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 1/12/23 |
||
July 13, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendant’s Response |
||
July 12, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 01, 2022 |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention for Preliminary Conference |
||
November 26, 2021 | Answer with Demands | ||
November 26, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 21, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 30, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.