Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Affrose Benetos, Affrose Benetos As Executor Of The Estate Of Motilal Deo, Deceased, Jacqueline Roman, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Greenberg, Hayley R., Merola, Jerry Anthony, against The New York City Employees Retirement System, represented by D'Cunha, Stacy Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Supreme with Heela Capell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: November 07, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: November 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 07, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: November 07, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Membership application
Date: November 07, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 23, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: August 23, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 23, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: August 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 23, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: August 23, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 23, 2022NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 23, 2022PETITION
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 16, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 16, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 18, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 20, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 10, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 20, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Proposed Amended Petition |
||
April 16, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4) Attorney's Affirmation in Support of Motion |
||
April 16, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) Notice of Motion to Add A Necessary Party |
||
March 20, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 18, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) | ||
March 07, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #3) Memo of Law in Reply and Further Support |
||
March 07, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3) | ||
March 04, 2024 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Stip to adjourn motion nos. 2 and 3 due to death of attorney |
||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2) and in reply to opposition to our main motion |
||
October 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.