Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Chia Kang Chen, Lan Chen, Shing Mei Chen, Westlake International Inc., filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Cplr 5239) case represented by Gopstein, Sheldon H, Mo, Hugh H., against Jianping Chen, Jing Chen, Joseph Fucito Sheriff, Ping Wang, represented by D'Orazio, Bernard, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Edgar G Walker presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 07, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Cplr 5239) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time71 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1)
Date: November 08, 2019ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: January 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 03, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 07, 2019RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 07, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: November 14, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: November 07, 2019ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: January 06, 2020PETITION
Date: November 07, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: November 07, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: January 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance for Hugh H. Mo |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 1/17/20 |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Decision and Order dismissing Petition and vacating TRO |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
January 17, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) MOTION TRIAL TERM 90 Judge: EDGAR G. WALKER |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING Answer - CORRECTION OF MISFILED DOCUMENT |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Affirmation of Bernard D'Orazio in Opposition to Petition |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Decision and Order denying motion to vacate Judgment |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Information Subpoenas served on Judgment Debtors |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.