Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Gold Pro, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Himmel, Andrew D, against Everyday Funding Group Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Supreme with Joy Campanelli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoy Campanelli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, Gold Pro, LLC, is suing the defendant, Everyday Funding Group LLC, for breach of contract, fraud, unjust enrichment, and money had and received. T...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 06, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 06, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 06, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 06, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 06, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 06, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 06, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 06, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 06, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 06, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 06, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 06, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 30, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4) *Corrected*
Date: October 30, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 05, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #5) Proposed Judgment |
||
March 06, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5) Affidavit of Service of Motion Papers for Default Judgment/Restoration |
||
March 06, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #5) Order to Show, Declined |
||
March 06, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #5) Motion to Restore Motion to Calendar |
||
March 06, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #5) Affidavit of Reza Islam |
||
March 06, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) Second Default Judgment Motion Papers |
||
March 06, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
March 06, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) First Default Judgment Motion Papers |
||
March 06, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Affidavit of Michael White |
||
March 06, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Summons and Verified Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.