Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Damian Chavez, Sylvia Chavez, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Henriques, Daniela F., Leav, Daniel T, against Berito'S Ii Deli & Grocery, Corp., represented by Apostolakos, Athanasia, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Lara J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Cycle Time1038 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 24, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 09, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 24, 2017NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: January 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 17, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2018AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: August 17, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 05, 2018ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 16, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 24, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 17, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2017AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 17, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 13, 2017NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 17, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 17, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 05, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 27, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 29, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 09, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 24, 2017ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 17, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: September 10, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 17, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 05, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 15, 2017ANSWER
Date: February 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 24, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Settled JURY COORDINATING PART 1 KPS-FNL (Conversion) Judge: Genovesi, Hon. Lara J. |
|
October 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 3SEL904 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
September 04, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 2SEL719 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
July 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 1SEL517 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
May 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PRE-TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
September 20, 2018 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) dated 9/11/018 |
||
September 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART GEXT (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
September 10, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 10, 2018 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.