Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sarah M. Lanza, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Davidoff, Ruben, against Guma Construction, Santo Mercedes Baez, represented by Lewis, Arlene Eudora, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Jury Coordinating Part 1 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJury Coordinating Part 1 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 18, 2020ANSWER
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: September 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 21, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 30, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: February 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 31, 2022STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: June 21, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 07, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: August 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 31, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 07, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: June 24, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 31, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 20, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 03, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: May 19, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE
Date: May 22, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: May 23, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 26, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE
Date: July 31, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 15, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: July 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: September 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Submitted per the directive of the Hon. I . Joseph. |
||
September 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #3) Brain Studies |
||
September 13, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
September 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #3) Affidavit of Dr. Jacqueline M. Lewis Devine sworn to on September 13, 2023 |
||
August 22, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Settlement Conference Scheduling Order dated 08/18/23 |
||
July 31, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
July 31, 2023 |
NOTICE Part 83 Rules -- Motion Day Team's Link |
||
July 26, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
July 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #3) Affirmation of Dr. Kenneth McCulloch Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affirmation of Dr. Kenneth McCulloch Redacted |
||
July 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #3) The sworn and notarized report of Dr. James Pugh |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.