Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm General Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Yasutake, Darrel Kalai'Puna, against General Electric Company, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Limited (23) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time161 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; State Farm General Ins. Co. vs. General Electric Co. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Feb 14 2007 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) 212320-Proof of Service: Summons (DLR) Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE: SUMMONS (DLR) [212320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed 222120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUMMONS: FILED [222120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 212210-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff COMPLAINT [212210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.