Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Onrie T. Hall, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tarasov, Igor, against Arnelge Escobar, Elsy R. Escobar Saravia, represented by Shapiro, Adam Philip, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Robin Sheares presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin Sheares Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 19, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 01, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: June 30, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 28, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 05, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 06, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 09, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 14, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 12, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 01, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: July 14, 2023STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
June 01, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
May 23, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) proposed cc oder |
||
January 12, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Notice Pursuant CPLR 3116(a) |
||
September 09, 2022 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
July 28, 2022 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
July 14, 2022 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
July 06, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dtd 6/27/22 |
||
June 30, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) PROPOSED CC ORDER |
||
January 19, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.