Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Roody Fabien, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Linder, Mark, against Elisa D Chrem, Michelle Stubbs, represented by Girin, Eugene, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Lara J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 27, 2020ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: February 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: December 27, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: December 27, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 04, 2019ANSWER
Date: April 04, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 09, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2021 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Genovesi, Hon. Lara J. |
|
March 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART NO ORD (Conversion) Judge: Genovesi, Hon. Lara J. |
|
October 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART GEXT (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
September 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Genovesi, Hon. Lara J. |
|
September 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
August 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
May 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
April 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Judge: Genovesi, Hon. Lara J. |
|
March 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
March 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial; 2X (Conversion) Judge: Genovesi, Hon. Lara J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.