Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Robert Grieves, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rickner, Robert H, against Alan Chau, The City Of New York, represented by , Mcguire, Mildred A., in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Kings Cdp22 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKings Cdp22 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Civil Rights) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 31, 2022ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: October 18, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 16, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 |
ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Answer |
||
March 16, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 31, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
January 31, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 31, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Chau - RJI for AOS |
||
November 30, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
October 19, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE City of New York |
||
October 19, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Lt. Chau |
||
September 06, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.