Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Marsha Higgins, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ratsenberg, Natalia, against John Doe, Lawrence Latimore, Robert E. Miles, Sonya T. Silvera, represented by Ahmed, Sheila, Badura, William S, Gangi, Ann, Gundlach, James George, Gafur, Faziah, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Ingrid Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 27, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2019RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 01, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 01, 2019ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 31, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 27, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 10, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 24, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 24, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #5)
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: July 09, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 24, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 24, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 25, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 24, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 02, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: September 02, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2021ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: July 09, 2021RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: July 09, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 20, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: September 20, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 27, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 27, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: April 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2022 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #5) The letter to adjourn dedline to file an opposition brief |
||
September 28, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
September 28, 2021 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
September 27, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendant's D&I Response |
||
September 20, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #5) Judgment Notice of Entry |
||
September 20, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
September 16, 2021 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 16, 2021 | ||
September 02, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #5) Order Notice of Entry |
||
September 02, 2021 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Judgment with Notice of Settlement |
||
August 23, 2021 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.