Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Donald Joachin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Linder, Mark, against Amarline Jeannis, represented by Shapiro, Adam Philip, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Wavny Toussaint presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time355 days |
ANSWER
Date: March 14, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 13, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 09, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2019 | Hearing |
Settled - Other CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Colon, Hon. Lizette |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
May 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
April 13, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Plaintiff and Defendant |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Plaintiff and Defendant |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.