Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Dana Burton As Administrator Of The Estate Of Marjorie Burton, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Alonso, Andres F., Krangle, David Bruce, against Sea Crest Acquisition 1, Llc D B A Sea Crest Nursing And Rehabilitation Center, represented by Ptashnik, Neil B, Sheeley, Andrew Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Lawrence S presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Nursing Home) |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 16, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 16, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2021 | Hearing | NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART | |
December 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
September 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Denied (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 65 2PM (Conversion) Judge: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren |
|
July 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART 2PM (Conversion) Judge: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren |
|
June 18, 2020 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #001) Decided: 09/17/2020Denied Before Justice: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren |
|
April 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART 4/2/20 (Conversion) Judge: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren |
|
March 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Final Adr Part 4/2/20 CCP (Conversion) Judge: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren |
|
February 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned General-Alternative Dispute CCP 4/2/20 (Conversion) Judge: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 12/12/2019 |
|
December 12, 2019 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.