Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ashley Kajileh, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Viener, Joseph B, against Joseph Kushnir, Trot Service Corp, Utica Taxi Center, Inc, represented by Mulholland, Rory Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Robin Sheares presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 27, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 02, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2018ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 08, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 07, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2018NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: February 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 18, 2020NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 18, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 05, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 16, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 13, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 18, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
November 05, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) dtd 3/10/20 |
|
March 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 68 SFO (Conversion) Judge: Baynes, Hon. Johnny Lee |
|
February 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Baynes, Hon. Johnny Lee |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Accident Report |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) registration records |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Pleadings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.