Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Viktor Yezhov, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Gitnik, Roman E, against 3115 Realty, Llc, Dsj Management Corp., represented by Colin, Robert P, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Wayne Saitta presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018ANSWER
Date: January 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stipulation of discontinuance |
||
January 06, 2021 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Saitta, Hon. Wayne P. |
|
July 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Saitta, Hon. Wayne P. |
|
April 01, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Judge: Saitta, Hon. Wayne P. |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
January 31, 2020 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial; 2X (Conversion) Judge: Saitta, Hon. Wayne P. |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
October 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Continued CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
June 13, 2019 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.