Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company A S O The 330-332 St Marks C O Sterling Town Equities And Alex Nordholm, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Rubinstein, Jeffrey M, against Expert Fire Sprinkler, Llc, B.G.M. Engineering, Llc, And The Phillips Group, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Joy Campanelli presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Property Damage) |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 30, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 09, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 30, 2019ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 30, 2019SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: November 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 26, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 20, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 29, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: August 28, 2020NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 30, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Default Judgment Conference PT 2X (Conversion) Judge: Default Judgement Part, |
|
February 17, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 22, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Dated 11/23/2020 |
||
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
December 01, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Default Judgment Conference PT 1X (Conversion) Judge: Default Judgement Part, |
|
November 17, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) DEFAULT JUDGMENT PART AM/ADM (Conversion) Judge: Default Judgement Part, |
|
October 26, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 28, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with notice of entry |
||
August 28, 2020 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note Of Issue and Certificate of Readiness |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.