Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Luis H. Quispe, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Chinigo, Dario Anthony, Hofmann, Paul Thomas, Ramirez, Ronald W, against Constantinos Charidemou, represented by Poling, Kristin Eileen, Stern, Michael Evan, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Joy Campanelli presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Fall From Ladder) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time95 days |
ANSWER
Date: December 21, 2018OBJECTIONS IN POINT OF LAW
Date: February 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 09, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 24, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 12, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 26, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 21, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 21, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 21, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 21, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE
Date: August 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 27, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 14, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 14, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3) 2023-5-2 Letter To Court Requesting Oral Argument |
||
March 27, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) in Reply to Def.'s Opp to P.'s Motion to Amend |
||
July 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #3) Answer to Petition to USDC |
||
July 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #3) Summons and Complaint |
||
July 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #3) Defendant's Answer |
||
July 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #3) Order Lifting Stay |
||
July 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #3) 2019-06-06 Order |
||
July 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #3) Stip. to Adjourn Motion |
||
July 27, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.