Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Shakiea Walker, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rynecki, Scott E, against Ebrahim M. Alqaifi, Gaber M. Alqaifi, Gabrielle Alexis Fox, Louis Dylan Quick, represented by Fontaine, Christine, Leven, Adrianne Joy, Leznikova, Allan, Mcevoy, John Philip, Lynch, Jerry Lee, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Karen B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 25, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 07, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 07, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 19, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 20, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 25, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 25, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 06, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 29, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 25, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: September 09, 2019AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 25, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 25, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 24, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 10, 2019NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 24, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 24, 2020NOTICE
Date: September 26, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: December 24, 2020NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: October 20, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 24, 2020ORDER - REMOTE DECISION
Date: June 25, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: February 23, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 27, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Short Form Order dated 06/16/2021 |
||
June 29, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) 06/16/2021 Order with Notice of Entry |
||
June 25, 2021 | ORDER - REMOTE DECISION | ||
March 31, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
February 23, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 23, 2021 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
January 27, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) email cores |
||
January 27, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) AffinOpp |
||
December 24, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) Exhibit 4 - 3.08.19 Verified Answer |
||
December 24, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.