Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of Bedford Courts Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Fogarty, Peter John, Krall, Denise Andrea, against Gladys R. Vertilus, Jacques F. Vertilus, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Pamela Fisher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Rpapl 881) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time77 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: November 13, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 16, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2018RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 09, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 09, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 09, 2018PETITION
Date: November 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) PART 94 STIP/DISC (Conversion) Judge: Fisher, Hon. Pamela L. |
|
January 16, 2019 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #001) Motion Term 94 Judge: Fisher, Hon. Pamela L. |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Term 94 Judge: Fisher, Hon. Pamela L. |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service of Petitioner's RPAPL 881 Application |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1) MS #1 |
|
November 19, 2018 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 01/16/2019Withdrawn Before Justice: Fisher, Hon. Pamela L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Fisher, Hon. Pamela L. |
|
November 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PART Judge: Fisher, Hon. Pamela L. |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected* | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.