Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Tymar Francis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Barenbaum, Bryan, against Wilbert Garnier, represented by Garrison, Michelle L, Glade, Alfred, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Peter Paul Sweeney, Pt73 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 07, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 24, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 06, 2019ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
March 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned General-Alternative Dispute 06/02/20 CCP (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 01/31/2020 |
|
January 31, 2020 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.