Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bruce Beaver, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Schnitzler, Mark Jeffrey, against Greg Buyalos, Paula J White, represented by Kerner, Kenneth Todd, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: November 09, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 10, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
March 10, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Gregg Buyalos |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Paula White |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.