Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Tevin Samuel v. Freddy Severino, Maggies Paratransit Corp., New York City Transit Authority
On October 01, 2019 a torts - motor vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Lorna Mcallister presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 01, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2021 | hearing |
CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART
Judge: McAllister, Hon. Lorna J. |
|
October 02, 2020 | hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: McAllister, Hon. Lorna J. |
|
September 02, 2020 | hearing |
Marked Off (Motion #002) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
August 04, 2020 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #002) Decided: 09/02/2020Granted Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
July 30, 2020 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 17 MGLFO (Conversion) Judge: Wan, Hon. Lillian |
|
July 30, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 17 AA (Conversion) Judge: Joseph, Hon. Ingrid |
|
July 21, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 17 AA (Conversion) Judge: Wan, Hon. Lillian |
|
April 03, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned INTAKE PART Judge: McAllister, Hon. Lorna J. |
|
April 03, 2020 | hearing |
Not Marked (Appearance) (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 10 FINAL (Conversion) Judge: McAllister, Hon. Lorna J. |
|
February 21, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 10 FINAL (Conversion) Judge: McAllister, Hon. Lorna J. |
|
February 21, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned INTAKE PART Judge: McAllister, Hon. Lorna J. |
|
February 19, 2020 | hearing |
Not Called (Calendar) (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 10 FINAL (Conversion) Judge: McAllister, Hon. Lorna J. |
|
February 19, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned INTAKE PART Judge: McAllister, Hon. Lorna J. |
|
December 18, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned INTAKE PART GEN-ADR 12/4/19 (Conversion) Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
December 18, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Term 70 FINAL (Conversion) Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
November 06, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned INTAKE PART GEN-ADR 12/4/19 (Conversion) Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
November 06, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Term 70 Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
October 22, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
October 16, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned INTAKE PART Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
October 01, 2019 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #001) Decided: 08/14/2020Granted Before Justice: Wan, Hon. Lillian Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Wan, Hon. Lillian |