Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Shimei Mcmillian, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Falkoff, Steven C., against Delancey Street Associates Llc., Delco Electrical Corp., Site 2 Dsa Commercial Llc, Sk Cabling Systems Llc, T.G. Nickel & Associates, Llc., (total of 5) See All represented by Conte, Michael J., Eschmann, Paul Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Devin P presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Slip & Fall) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time543 days |
ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 08, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 27, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: September 23, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 15, 2019STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: July 08, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 02, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 19, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 23, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
May 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART STP DSC 5/26/2020 (Conversion) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Devin P. |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
February 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial; 2X (Conversion) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Devin P. |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of of Entry with Order |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE order dated 10/31/2019 |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 10/31/2019 |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY (POST RJI) Notice of Substitution of Attorney |
|
October 31, 2019 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 9 SFO (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
October 31, 2019 | Hearing |
Continued CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.