Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Frieda Hamway, Gail Maslaton, Joan Sitt, Judith Paskie, Rachelle Jemal, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Chubak, Jeffrey Scott, Storch, Steven Gary, against Albert Sutton, Frida Sutton, Isaac Sutton, Moses Sutton, The Isaac C.M. Sutton 1999 Investment Trust, (total of 5) See All represented by Corley, Caroline Fletcher, Kobre, Ethan Allen, Libou, Jason Louis, Wagner, Stephen, Weintraub, Evan Scott, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Reginald Boddie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 15, 2019MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 16, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: January 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 16, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 16, 2019ANSWER
Date: December 20, 2018STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 28, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 15, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 11, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 29, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 14, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 09, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 29, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 09, 2018PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2019ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: January 16, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 28, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 15, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: November 12, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: September 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2019ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: January 16, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 15, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 15, 2019NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 15, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2019SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 11, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 06, 2019NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: November 27, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 09, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
November 09, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 11/9/2022 |
||
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
May 12, 2020 | Hearing |
Commercial Part Conf 12 SC (Conversion) Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
|
March 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Commercial Part Conf 12 SC (Conversion) Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
|
December 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Commercial Part Conf 12 SC /STIP (Conversion) Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
November 14, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Commercial Part Conf 12 SC (Conversion) Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.