Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Nadeem Chaudhry, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Cappello, Thomas Joseph, against Suryanarayan Anand M.D., Suryanarayan Anand, M.D. P.C., Suryanarayan Anand, Physician, P.C., represented by Benvenuto, Thomas J, Drury, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Ellen M. Spodek, Pt 63 presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time472 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) *Corrected*
Date: March 24, 2020ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: February 19, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: June 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 13, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 13, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 06, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 06, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | |
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) *Corrected* | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Redacted |
|
February 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART ORD REJ (Conversion) Judge: Spodek, Hon. Ellen M. |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 2/11/20 |
|
February 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001) Motion Term 63 Judge: Spodek, Hon. Ellen M. |
|
February 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Spodek, Hon. Ellen M. |
|
January 31, 2020 | Hearing |
Held Mm-Alternative Dispute Res Supreme Trial; CCP 2/2 (Conversion) Judge: Spodek, Hon. Ellen M. |
|
January 28, 2020 | Motion |
Extend - Time (Motion #001) Decided: 02/11/2020Granted Before Justice: Spodek, Hon. Ellen M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Spodek, Hon. Ellen M. |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Proposed Notice of Medical Malpractice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.