Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Charlton C. Beckford, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Spektor, Gregory, against Bradley Amazan, Keisha M. Amazan, represented by Girin, Eugene, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Dawn M. Jimenez Salta, Pt 20 presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time434 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: January 22, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 26, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 08, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discontinuance |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 1/15/2020 |
|
January 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Settled - Other NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART SETTLED (Conversion) Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
|
January 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 88 N/A/MOV (Conversion) Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
|
January 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
|
December 06, 2019 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #001) Decided: 01/15/2020Denied Before Justice: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Defendant's EBT Transcript |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.