Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Debra Quinones, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Bader, Jeffrey W, against 416 C Llc, El Solitario Produce & Meat Inc., Ldb Properties, represented by Cogan, Howard L, Efrati, Laura, Jonak, Marguerite Lieu, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Carl J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Fall) |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time629 days |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 23, 2019NOTICE
Date: July 31, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 14, 2020ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION (Motion #1)
Date: April 02, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 24, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 30, 2019ANSWER
Date: May 29, 2019ANSWER
Date: April 17, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: March 29, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 08, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 29, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 31, 2020 | NOTICE | ||
July 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART STIP/DISC, FILED 8/14/20 (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
April 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated: 1/27/2020 |
|
January 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial; 2X (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
October 07, 2019 | Hearing |
Continued CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.