Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Lissette Caicedo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cherny, Aleksandr Simon, Podolsky, Steven Vyacheslav, against Clintel Steed, Tamara Zahaykevich, Yolytxa Valera, represented by Doyle, Dennis T, Iervasi, Rocco, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Peter Paul presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time301 days |
ANSWER
Date: March 18, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 12, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 28, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 28, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Settled - Other Conference Term 73 DISCONT (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Verified Answer with Cross Claim |
|
March 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned INTAKE PART Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars, Demands and Multiple Procedural Notices |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth for JL |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) and Demands |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.