Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jacqueline Gomez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ashurov, Yefim, Cherny, Aleksandr Simon, Itin, Jessica Gabrielle, Podolsky, Steven Vyacheslav, against Devorah Wolff, represented by Meade, John Steger, Rankin, Carolyn S., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Jury Coordinating Part 1 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: March 03, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: March 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 10, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 24, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 25, 2021NOTICE
Date: October 31, 2020NOTICE
Date: March 23, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 02, 2020NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2) Discovery Demands
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 10, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: March 10, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 05, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 05, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 18, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 10, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 10, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 20, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 13, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 13, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 28, 2018ANSWER
Date: December 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Dated: 03/30/2022 |
||
April 05, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Orthopedic Surgeon IME 2/28/22 |
||
March 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Uber Trip Ticket |
||
March 29, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
March 10, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected* Notice of Motion & Affirmation in Good Faith |
||
March 10, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
March 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Discovery Demands Discovery Demands Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Order |
||
March 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) New IME Appointment Ltr |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.