Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hassan Asous, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Abruzzino, Robert G, against Brenda Stitt, Jason Hassell, represented by Shapiro, Adam Philip, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Debra Silber presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time561 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 07, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 20, 2018ANSWER
Date: January 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Settled - Other NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Judge: Colon, Hon. Lizette |
|
May 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
December 10, 2019 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
December 05, 2019 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial; 2X (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
August 01, 2019 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
July 30, 2019 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
April 24, 2019 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 22, 2019 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
March 28, 2019 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.