Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Jimelle P. Girod, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Zelman, David Alexis, against Doreen Lobasso, Herbert A. Pineda, Samantha Eve Lobasso, represented by Mernin, Michael Joseph, Omahen, Devan Marie, Spencer, Sean Michael, Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Jury Coordinating Part 1 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018ANSWER
Date: April 16, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 09, 2019ANSWER
Date: February 12, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2018ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A.2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A.1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: August 09, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B.1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B.2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A.3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 26, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 13, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 26, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 04, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: August 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 26, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 01, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 26, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: July 01, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 01, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 26, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: July 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 04, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 10, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 04, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 11, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 11, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 13, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 20, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 09, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 01, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 01, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 01, 2020NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 01, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 24, 2023ORDER - JOINT TRIAL Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 10, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Exchange |
||
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
October 01, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) Dated 9/29/2020 |
||
September 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #005) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART GEXT (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
September 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #004) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART GEXT (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
September 11, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 11, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #005) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
September 09, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 09/08/20 nsp ms#2,3 |
||
September 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #003) Motion Trial Term 65 10:00 A.M. (Conversion) Judge: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.