Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Chaim Gendel And, In The Matter Of The Application Of Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A. And, Toby Gendel, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Toscano, Thomas A, against For An Order Cancelling Of Record A Satisfaction Of Mortgage Pursuant To New York Real Property Law 329, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Steven Mostofsky presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Cancellation Of Instrumen) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time15 days |
RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 06, 2018ORDER - EXPARTE
Date: November 21, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 28, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 06, 2018EXPARTE ORDER - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: November 06, 2018PETITION
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 11/20/18 nsp |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - EXPARTE exparte order denied by pt 72 judge. |
|
November 21, 2018 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) Conference Part 98 EX PARTE ORD DENIED (Conversion) Judge: Mostofsky, Hon. Steven Z. |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXPARTE ORDER - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Proposed Order Cancelling a Satisfaction of Mortgage of Record |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Affidavit of Service on New York City Department of Finance |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Lender in Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.