Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Eva Rozman, Josef Rozman, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Seskin, Scott Howard, against Axis Insurance Company, Difazio Industries, Llc, National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, Pa, represented by Ahlstrand, Elizabeth F., Mccoy, Heather Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Bruce M. Balter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Declaratory Judgement) |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 11, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: May 13, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: March 04, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: March 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: March 04, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: March 04, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 01, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date:STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 03, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 5/2/19 |
|
May 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Denied (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 35 NAES (Conversion) Judge: Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. |
|
April 04, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) STIP OF DISCONTINUANCE WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
March 05, 2019 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #001) Decided: 05/02/2019Denied Before Justice: Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Stipulations Extending Time to Plead |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) 1/4/19 Notice of Motion/Affirmation in Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.