Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Timeworks Worldwide Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lieberman, Benjamin J., against Delta Sales Group Co. Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions48 days |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time50 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: January 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
November 22, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.