Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Saad Najeh Jaradat, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cherny, Aleksandr Simon, Itin, Jessica Gabrielle, Podolsky, Steven Vyacheslav, against The City Of New York, William Millian, represented by Counsel, Corporation, Scoville, William Beecher, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Kings Cdp25 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time679 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 28, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018NOTICE
Date: August 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 28, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 16, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: September 16, 2020NOTICE
Date: August 20, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 31, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 16, 2020 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
September 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) CITY 25 STIP/DISC, FILED 9/16/20 (Conversion) Judge: Levine, Hon. Katherine A. |
|
August 28, 2020 | NOTICE | ||
August 20, 2020 | NOTICE | ||
April 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Final Adr City Part 9/15/19 (Conversion) Judge: Levine, Hon. Katherine A. |
|
February 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned City-Alternative Dispute Resol 9/15/19 CC (Conversion) Judge: Levine, Hon. Katherine A. |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 12/23/2019 |
|
December 23, 2019 | Hearing |
Held CITY 25 Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Levine, Hon. Katherine A. |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.