Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Janet Mitchell, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Pirrotti, Jr, Anthony, against Bon Secours Community Hospital, Marc J. Rosenblatt D.O., Middletown Medical, P.C., Ord Physiatry Pc, Pain, Spine & Sports Medicine P.C., (total of 6) See All represented by Bauer, Ari I, Darius, Olivia, Delvecchio, Laura Anne, Dufficy, Doreen, Ernenwein, Paul Sherwood, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Pamela L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 14, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 05, 2019DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL
Date: February 19, 2019ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 17, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 04, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: March 04, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 08, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 17, 2019ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: February 25, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 17, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 17, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 15, 2019ANSWER
Date: February 19, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 11, 2019DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL
Date: March 26, 2019ANSWER
Date: April 23, 2019NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 16, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 23, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 26, 2019ANSWER
Date: July 25, 2019ANSWER
Date: August 14, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 23, 2019ANSWER
Date: July 30, 2019ANSWER
Date: September 17, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 06, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: July 25, 2019ANSWER
Date: September 17, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 10, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 01, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 25, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: May 08, 2019NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 16, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 22, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 14, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 11, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Mm-Alternative Dispute Res 11:30 (Conversion) Judge: Fisher, Hon. Pamela L. |
|
April 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Mm-Alternative Dispute Res CCP 4/1/20 (Conversion) Judge: Steinhardt, Hon. Marsha |
|
December 17, 2019 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 13, 2019 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Steinhardt, Hon. Marsha |
|
November 15, 2019 | Notice of Medical Malpractice Action | ||
November 14, 2019 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter requesting preliminary conference |
||
November 01, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
November 01, 2019 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses |
||
October 10, 2019 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's Demands for Disclosure |
||
October 10, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.