Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reynaldo Vargas, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Davoli, Henry W, against Pennsylvania Avenue Associates, L.P., represented by Kramer, Lisa Renee, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Francois A. Rivera (Pt. 52) presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time434 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018ANSWER
Date: April 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | |
January 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Settled - Other CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Colon, Hon. Lizette |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order dated 09/20/2019 |
|
September 20, 2019 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Rivera, Hon. Francois A. |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Verified Answer |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.