Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Aviva Wulliger, City Of New York Environmental Control Board, City Of New York Parking Violations Bureau, City Of New York Transit Adjudication Bureau, Israel Wulliger, (total of 6) See All represented by Francis, Aviva, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Dear-For.Resolution Pt 1 presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time436 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)
Date: December 27, 2019ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: March 06, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2019ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: January 14, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 02, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 26, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 19, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 1/31/20 |
|
January 31, 2020 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) For. Resolution Part1-Motion NA DEFT (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
January 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
January 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Settled - Other FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF A Supreme Trial; NAD NSF (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Adjournment Letter |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
|
December 23, 2019 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #001) Decided: 01/31/2020Granted Before Justice: Dear, Hon. Noach Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) ORDER CANCELING LIS PENDENS AND DISCONTINUING ACTION |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.