Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Jean Eder Syllas, Kerry Ann Gross, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cherny, Aleksandr Simon, Podolsky, Steven Vyacheslav, Tucker, Jordan Wayne, against A. Am. James-Malcolm, John Doe, Roger D. Lancaster, represented by Cobenas, Ashley Marie, Leven, Adrianne Joy, Mcevoy, John Philip, Mctiernan, William Brian, Stanger, Katherine Agnes, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Bruce M. Balter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 08, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: December 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)
Date: May 25, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2)
Date: May 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: May 19, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: May 19, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: December 12, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: December 12, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: November 21, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 08, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 15, 2019ANSWER
Date: May 15, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 20, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 20, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 04, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2020 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART FADR (Conversion) Judge: Balter, Hon. Bruce M. |
|
September 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Motion Trial Term 13 Judge: Balter, Hon. Bruce M. |
|
June 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Motion Trial Term 13 ADM/ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Balter, Hon. Bruce M. |
|
June 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Balter, Hon. Bruce M. |
|
May 25, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) | |
May 19, 2020 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #002) Decided: 09/15/2020Granted Before Justice: Balter, Hon. Bruce M. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Balter, Hon. Bruce M. |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2) | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) CENTRALIZED COMPLIANCE PART ORDER |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.