Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Ernesto Lentini, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Katz, Richard J, Rapport, Jonathan A, against Fulisa Llc, Mjm 7302 Llc, The Juliet M. Mazzarisi Irrevocable Trust, represented by Barreras, Charles John, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Peter Paul presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time486 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 06, 2020ANSWER
Date: May 30, 2019STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
March 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Settled - Other Conference Term 73 Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
December 16, 2019 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order Dated 09/03/2019 |
|
September 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Affirmation of Good Faith | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.