Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Leroy Chin-Sue, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Babat, Eric M, Babat, Eric Martin, Polo, Adam D., against Michael Brenner, represented by Shapiro, Adam Philip, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Donald Kurtz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018ORDER - JOINT TRIAL
Date: April 22, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 21, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 21, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 30, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 07, 2021 | Hearing |
Remand NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
July 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
June 26, 2020 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 90 AM/ADM (Conversion) Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
April 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
March 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 90 AM/ADM (Conversion) Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
March 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
January 28, 2020 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #001) Decided: 06/26/2020Denied Before Justice: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Chin appeal |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) doctor report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.