Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
John Pesce, filed a(n) Torts - Product Liability (Defective Rope) case represented by Tanenbaum, Ted J., against Cullen & Dykman, Llp, Gardner Bender, Inc., represented by Sparling, John E, Vignali, Rosario M., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Product Liability (Defective Rope) |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time41 days |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 17, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2018 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
December 10, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CULLEN & DYKMNAN 12/3/2018 |
||
December 04, 2018 | NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) | ||
November 06, 2018 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.