Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bolduc, Kristin Marie, Falasco, Todd C, Ng, James C., O'Connor, Ruth, Smith, Jordan M, (total of 5) See All against Elliot Frankel, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau, (total of 5) See All represented by Katz, Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Dear-For.Resolution Pt 1 presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time398 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 18, 2018ANSWER
Date: December 20, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: April 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 20, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: April 18, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #1)
Date: April 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: September 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: November 05, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: April 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 11, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 07, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 28, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: September 06, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: December 17, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2)
Date: December 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #003) For. Resolution Part1-Motion CASE DISMISSED (Conversion) Judge: Partnow, Hon. Mark I. |
|
August 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Partnow, Hon. Mark I. |
|
July 28, 2020 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #003) Decided: 09/28/2020Withdrawn Before Justice: Partnow, Hon. Mark I. Answer demanded: No Judge: Partnow, Hon. Mark I. |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Notice of Appeal of Order on Mot. Seq. Nos. 1 and 2 |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Decision And Order dated 12/09/2019 |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) Decision And Order dated 12/09/2019 |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | |
November 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) For. Resolution Part1-Motion CASE DISMISSED, MOTION GRANTED (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
November 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) For. Resolution Part1-Motion Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.