Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Francis Del Monaco, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Monaco, Joseph D., against Prospect Park Alliance, Inc., The City Of New York, represented by Cunningham, William Briggs, Klauber, Andrew L, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Peter Paul Sweeney, Pt73 presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time577 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 22, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 19, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 11, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART STP DSC 1/30/2020 (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
January 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial; 2X (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
September 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Continued CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Discovery |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.